Global Patent Index - EP 0866208 A3

EP 0866208 A3 2001-02-14 - Roller Shutter

Title (en)

Roller Shutter

Title (de)

Rolladen

Title (fr)

Volet roulant

Publication

EP 0866208 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98870055 A

Priority

BE 9700243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866208A2] This invention relates to an assembly of a roller shutter (1) and a locking, whereby the roller shutter (1) can be rolled up and down between an open and a closed position, and the locking is provided for locking the roller shutter (1) in the closed position, which locking comprises a bolt (6), which is movable between a locked and an unlocked position, whereby the locking comprises a bolt which is provided to be movable into and out of a perforation (7) provided in the roller shutter (1), by means of a controllable drive mechanism (3), which drive mechanism (3) is provided for exerting an authorised force to the bolt (6) for the movement of the bolt between the locked and unlocked position, which drive mechanism (3) is connected to means for neutralising an external, unauthorised unlocking force exerted on the bolt (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01); E06B 9/86 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/86 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 65/0021 (2013.01); E05B 53/003 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0015 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0023 (2013.01); E06B 2009/802 (2013.01); E06B 2009/804 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866208 A2 19980923; EP 0866208 A3 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-12-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI