Global patent index - EP 0866210 A3

EP 0866210 A3 2001-01-10 - Method for operating a tool and apparatus for transmission of rotary torque and speed of rotation of a drive unit to that tool

Title (en)

Method for operating a tool and apparatus for transmission of rotary torque and speed of rotation of a drive unit to that tool

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Arbeitsmoduls und Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Drehmomenten und Drehzahlen eines Antriebsaggregats in das Arbeitsmodul

Title (fr)

Méthode d'actionnement d'un outil et dispositif pour la transmission de couple et de vitesse de rotation d'un organe d'entraînement vers cet outil

Publication

EP 0866210 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104400 A

Priority

DE 19711479 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866210A2] This patent concerns downhole power transmission, e.g. to a hydraulic jaws assembly, with both drive and control through the drillstring. The new unit drives a working module (5) through an assembly (2) (drillstring) transmitting torque and speed (hereafter: rotation). A drive unit (3) transmits power to a working module. At intervals, on alteration of a direction of rotation, hydraulic power is produced and transmitted to the drive unit. This carries out a further function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 27/00; E21B 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/00 (2006.01); E21B 11/04 (2006.01); E21B 27/00 (2006.01); E21B 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 27/00 (2013.01); E21B 4/00 (2013.01); E21B 31/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 3194329 A 19650713 - WALLERS RICHARD A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866210 A2 19980923; EP 0866210 A3 20010110; EP 0866210 B1 20040114; AT 257902 T 20040115; CN 1196436 A 19981021; CZ 294862 B6 20050413; CZ 9800828 A3 19981014; DE 19711479 A1 19980924; DE 19711479 C2 20021024; ES 2212159 T3 20040716; HK 1011556 A1 20040917; JP H10325289 A 19981208; KR 100546497 B1 20060417; PL 186953 B1 20040430; PL 325438 A1 19980928

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: RIEMSER PHARMA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 257902

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140409

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040614

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-03-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-03-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-09-17 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1011556

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2212159

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-04-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI