Global patent index - EP 0866228 A3

EP 0866228 A3 2000-12-13 - Pump unit

Title (en)

Pump unit

Title (de)

Pumpenaggregat

Title (fr)

Unité de pompage

Publication

EP 0866228 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102964 A

Priority

DE 19711088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866228A2] The pump is for a heating system and is driven by an electric motor. The speed may be controlled by an electronic regulating circuit. There is a separate module for setting one or more operating parameters. The pump control module is preset with data with regard to the pump throttling and regulating curves. These settings may be changed by the separate module. The speed of the pump may be regulated by changing the frequency and the phase relationships of the current fed to it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866228 A2 19980923; EP 0866228 A3 20001213

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021010

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010407

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI