Global Patent Index - EP 0866280 A3

EP 0866280 A3 2000-04-26 - Connection adapter

Title (en)

Connection adapter

Title (de)

Anschlussadapter

Title (fr)

Raccord adaptateur

Publication

EP 0866280 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98103869 A

Priority

DE 19711179 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866280A2] The adapter (1) comprises a casing (2) with conductor channels for a system, in which one or several gyroscope pumps (7) are hydraulically connected over compatible system connections with components, such as single or multiple-path valves (4) and/or distributor parts. The apertures of the system connections lie in planes, which are parallel to the rotation plane of an impeller of the gyroscope pump. Connection nozzles (10,11,12) are provided, whose apertures lie in planes vertically to the system connections. The connection nozzles enable the connection in conventional piping, especially in heating systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866280 A2 19980923; EP 0866280 A3 20000426; EP 0866280 B1 20040901; DE 19711179 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100305

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090304

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811880 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI