Global patent index - EP 0866281 A3

EP 0866281 A3 2000-04-26 - A stand-off for a heating- or cooling radiator for mounting such a radiator on a distance from a part of a biulding

Title (en)

A stand-off for a heating- or cooling radiator for mounting such a radiator on a distance from a part of a biulding

Title (de)

Heizkörper- bzw. Kühlkörper-Abstandsvorrichtung zum Fixieren eines Abstandes eines solchen Körpers von einem Gebäudeteil

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'écart pour radiateur de chauffage ou de refroidissement pour monter un tel radiateur à une distance d'un élément de construction

Publication

EP 0866281 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101823 A

Priority

DE 29704808 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866281A2] A first spacer piece (10) is fixed to a building part and is joined to a second spacer piece (20) on which a pipe is placed. The two spacer pieces are fixed in a first direction set by the longitudinal direction of the joined spacer pieces. The distance between the two spacer pieces is adjustable. The connection is in the form of an elastic snap connection. A fastening preventing the connection from undoing consists of a collar or sleeve. The two spacer pieces have two couplings (14,22) each in the form of screws, rivets, snap connections or positive locks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0259 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0206 (2013.01); F24D 19/0289 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29704808 U1 19970522; EP 0866281 A2 19980923; EP 0866281 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI