Global Patent Index - EP 0866283 A3

EP 0866283 A3 2000-04-26 - Device for monitoring and controlling climatisation elements

Title (en)

Device for monitoring and controlling climatisation elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Überwachen und Steuern von Elementen der Klimatechnik

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance et de commande d'élements de climatisation

Publication

EP 0866283 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102761 A

Priority

  • DE 19711063 A
  • DE 19753199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866283A2] The device monitors and controls elements of air-conditioning technology, especially fire protection flaps (1), air flaps, ventilation grilles, air outlets, etc. which are connected to a central office (3). It has at least one sensor for an end position - open or closed - assigned to the elements. Two Hall-effect end-switches are assigned to each element, whereby the one detects the open position of the element and the other, the closed position with preferably an intermediate position. Each Hall switch lies on a bus conductor which is wired in parallel. Each single Hall switch is addressed and the addressing takes place automatically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00; A62C 2/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/24 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/24 (2013.01); F24F 11/70 (2018.01); F24F 11/35 (2018.01); F24F 2140/40 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866283 A2 19980923; EP 0866283 A3 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAKO KLIMA LUFT FERDINAND SCHAD KG

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 11/00 A, 7A 62C 2/24 B

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI