Global Patent Index - EP 0866381 B1

EP 0866381 B1 2007-10-31 - Electrostatic transport system for tonered sheets

Title (en)

Electrostatic transport system for tonered sheets

Title (de)

Elektrostatisches Transportsystem für Blätter mit Tonerbildern

Title (fr)

Système de transport électrostatique de feuilles comprenant des images de toner

Publication

EP 0866381 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98200361 A

Priority

  • EP 98200361 A
  • EP 97200790 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866381A1] A system is described for transporting sheet-like material (95). The sheet (95) has a powder (96), such as electrographic toner particles, loosely attached to it at one or both sides. The particles may be laid down in an image-wise manner by an electrophotographic or direct electrographic system, such as a printer or a copier. The sheet is transported by an endless belt or by a drum. In order to preserve the location of toner particles on the sheet, and to establish correct transportation of the sheet, electrostatic charges are applied either to the sheet or the transporting member or both. As such, the sheet suitably adheres to the transport system and electrostatically loaded toner particles may even adhere better to the sheet. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/657 (2013.01); B65H 5/004 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866381 A1 19980923; EP 0866381 B1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100206

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100206

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69838628 P 20071213

2007-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2007-10-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PUNCH GRAPHIX INTERNATIONAL N.V.

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON INTERNATIONAL N.V.

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010925

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON NV

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990323

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI