Global Patent Index - EP 0866482 B1

EP 0866482 B1 2000-07-26 - Improved low cost thermostat apparatus and method for calibrating same

Title (en)

Improved low cost thermostat apparatus and method for calibrating same

Title (de)

Niedrigpreisthermostat und Verfahren zu seiner Kalibrierung

Title (fr)

Thermostat à prix bas et son procédé d'étallonage

Publication

EP 0866482 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98301923 A

Priority

US 4082197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866482A1] A low cost thermostatic switch (10) has first and second scoop shaped terminal members (12. 14) having flanges (12e. 14e) received on ledges (20f) formed on opposed sidewalls (20e) of a housing (20). The terminal members are spaced apart with the distal end portions (20g) of the sidewalls of the housing bent over to clamp the terminal members to the housing with a strip (16) of electrical insulation placed therebetween. A movable contact arm (22, 22', 22") is cantilever mounted on the bottom wall (14a) of one terminal member (14) movable into and out of electrical engagement with a stationary contact (26) mounted on the bottom wall (12a) of the other terminal member. A motion transfer pin member (28) is adjustably mounted on the movable contact arm and extends downwardly toward a thermostatic snap-acting disc (30) received on a disc seat (20b) formed on the bottom wall (20a) of the housing with the disc adapted to transfer motion through the motion transfer pin member (28) to move the movable contact arm out of electrical engagement with the stationary contact (26) in one of the two oppositely dished configurations of the disc. A spring 32 is mounted in the housing (20) in a modified thermostatic switch (10') to maintain snap-acting disc on the disc seat (20b) regardless of the orientation of the switch. The switch is calibrated by adjusting the position of the motion transfer pin relative to a reference level to be within a selected gap and then deforming the sidewalls of the housing until the movable contact moves out of electrical engagement with the stationary contact (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01K 15/00 (2006.01); H01H 37/12 (2006.01); H01H 37/22 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/54 (2013.01); H01H 37/22 (2013.01); H01H 2037/5454 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866482 A1 19980923; EP 0866482 B1 20000726; DE 69800228 D1 20000831; DE 69800228 T2 20010104; JP H10294048 A 19981104

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050313

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2004-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040302

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040205

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800228 20000831

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990217

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI