Global Patent Index - EP 0866521 B1

EP 0866521 B1 2000-07-05 - Male connector for printed circuit board

Title (en)

Male connector for printed circuit board

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für eine gedruckte Leiterplatte

Title (fr)

Partie mâle de connecteur pour circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 0866521 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400609 A

Priority

  • EP 97400609 A
  • FR 9601953 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2745122A1] The connector has an outer section holding an inner isolating body (7). The forward section holds connector pins (5) which protrude forming the male plug. The connector pins are extended to form long prongs (6) supported internally and protruding from the body to pass through and be soldered in holes in the printed circuit board (3). The extended pins have groove sections (22) near the end of each connector pin, and there is the static bloc retention piece (19) which has projections (22) which latch with the grooves in the pins to hold the pins in place and prevent lateral movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/424; H01R 12/18; H01R 13/426

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/426 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/426 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 13/521 (2013.01); H01R 43/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2745122 A1 19970822; FR 2745122 B1 19980515; EP 0866521 A1 19980923; EP 0866521 B1 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-03-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010607

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702436

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/424 A, 7H 01R 13/426 B, 7H 01R 12/18 B

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990427

1999-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB LI

1999-06-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1999-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990211

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI