Global Patent Index - EP 0866567 A3

EP 0866567 A3 2001-03-28 - Transmission/reception unit with bidirectional equalization

Title (en)

Transmission/reception unit with bidirectional equalization

Title (de)

Sende-Empfangs-Einheit mit Zweirichtungsentzerrung

Title (fr)

Unité de transmission-réception avec égalisation bi-directionnel

Publication

EP 0866567 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98400543 A

Priority

ES 9700530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866567A2] The present invention refers to a transmission/reception unit that exchanges data with a remote unit by means of a channel using distributed modulation/demodulation treatment means. The transmission/reception unit includes equalization means (23) to equalize a first signal received from said remote unit and predistortion means to predistort a second signal transmitted to said remote unit. According to the invention, the unit is characterized in that the modulation/demodulation treatment means operate in a non-linear way and the unit includes means (230) to store information that is representative of a non-linear distortion of said modulation/demodulation treatment means and which defines a non-linear reference, and means (233) to adjust coefficients (CO) in the equalization means (23) according to the signal received from the remote unit and said representative information, the mentioned adjusted coefficients being transmitted to said predistortion means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/38; H04L 25/03; H04L 27/10; H04L 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 14/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/40 (2006.01); H04B 7/005 (2006.01); H04L 25/03 (2006.01); H04L 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 25/03146 (2013.01); H04B 1/40 (2013.01); H04L 27/2017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9613109 A1 19960502 - ALCATEL NV [NL], et al
  • [A] KAMIO Y ET AL: "System design on wide-band 16 QAM/TDMA for land mobile communications", WIRELESS NETWORKS - CATCHING THE MOBILE FUTURE - 5TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS (PIMRC'94), AND ICCC REGIONAL MEETING ON WIRELESS COMPUTER NETWORKS (WCN), PROCEEDINGS OF WIRELESS NETWORKS CATCHING, 1994, Amsterdam, Netherlands, IOS Press, Netherlands, pages 219 - 224 vol.1, XP002158491

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866567 A2 19980923; EP 0866567 A3 20010328; AU 5829998 A 19980917; AU 739837 B2 20011018; CA 2229182 A1 19980911; JP H10271051 A 19981009; SG 63823 A1 19990330; US 2001000703 A1 20010503; US 6205170 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031001

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04B 1/38 A, 7H 04L 27/10 B, 7H 04L 25/03 B, 7H 04L 27/20 B

1999-03-31 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-02-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI