Global Patent Index - EP 0866576 A3

EP 0866576 A3 2000-08-30 - RDS-receiver for the evaluation of traffic information messages

Title (en)

RDS-receiver for the evaluation of traffic information messages

Title (de)

RDS-Empfänger für die Auswertung von Verkehrshinweisen

Title (fr)

Récepteur RDS pour l'évaluation de messages d'information routière

Publication

EP 0866576 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98104651 A

Priority

DE 19711540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0866576A2] The RDS receiver (2) decodes RDS information detected by an aerial (1) to provide traffic message channel (TMC) statements. These can be in the form of warnings about delays, accidents, etc. The decoded messages are fed to a control unit (3) that checks the location information relative to the vehicle position as determined by a navigation system (5) and allows the data to be stored in a memory (4) and automatically retrieved when appropriate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 60/51 (2008.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/093 (2013.01); H04H 60/51 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0866576 A2 19980923; EP 0866576 A3 20000830; DE 19711540 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG CAR INTERMEDIA SYSTEM GMBH

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI