Global Patent Index - EP 0866653 A4

EP 0866653 A4 2002-11-20 - METHOD OF DETERMINING GENDER IN POULTRY

Title (en)

METHOD OF DETERMINING GENDER IN POULTRY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESRIMMUNG DES GESCHLECHTS BEI GEFLÜGEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DU SEXE DES VOLAILLES

Publication

EP 0866653 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96941433 A

Priority

  • GB 9604089 A
  • US 9618713 W
  • US 779595 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9719588A1] The present invention relates to a method of rapidly determining the gender of fowl. The present invention further relates to a new breed of turkey wherein the down is colored in a gender specific manner and wherein the color fades to white by the time the turkey reaches adulthood. The invention also provides isolated DNA encoding Gender-specific Fading Down proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/02; B07C 5/342; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 45/00 (2006.01); A01K 67/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2013.01); A01K 45/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0433084 A2 19910619 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [X] ASMUNDSON, V.S.: "Sex-Linkage in the Turkey", JOURNAL OF HEREDITY, vol. 41, no. 8, August 1950 (1950-08-01), pages 205 - 207, XP001097716
  • See also references of WO 9719588A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9719588 A1 19970605; CA 2239050 A1 19970605; EP 0866653 A1 19980930; EP 0866653 A4 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040106

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030623

2002-11-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980630

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE