Global Patent Index - EP 0866748 A4

EP 0866748 A4 2000-03-01 - AUTOMATED SLIDE STAINING SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTOMATED SLIDE STAINING SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES PROBENFÄRBESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME AUTOMATIQUE POUR COLORATION DE LAMES

Publication

EP 0866748 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95936871 A

Priority

  • US 9513155 W
  • US 50635895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9703827A1] The present invention provides an automatic slide staining system (10) which will process stained slides, such as cytology or histology specimens. The present invention includes two embodiments for the staining system. The first system includes a slide storage device (12), a slide transport apparatus (14), a first platen (16) including a plurality of staining stations (18), a heating station (64), and a housing (20). In order to utilize the first embodiment of the system of the present invention, the stained slides are placed in the storage device (12). The slides are removed from the storage device (12) and are processed on the various stations via the transport apparatus (14). The first system can be altered slightly so that a cover slip apparatus can be incorporated within the system. In order to do so, the heating station (64) is removed. A cover slip dispensing apparatus replaces the heating station. This will permit for a cover slip to be placed on the stained slide after a complete transverse of the slide staining stations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/312 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4219529 A 19800826 - MEYER ROBERT J [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 127 (P - 360) 31 May 1985 (1985-05-31)
  • See also references of WO 9703827A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9703827 A1 19970206; AU 3860395 A 19970218; CA 2227791 A1 19970206; EP 0866748 A1 19980930; EP 0866748 A4 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011217

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY LLC

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980209

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE