Global Patent Index - EP 0866850 A4

EP 0866850 A4 2000-11-22 - AUXINIC ANALOGUES OF INDOLE-3-ACETIC ACID

Title (en)

AUXINIC ANALOGUES OF INDOLE-3-ACETIC ACID

Title (de)

AUXIN ANALOGE

Title (fr)

ANALOGUES AUXINIQUES D'ACIDE INDOLE-3-ACETIQUE

Publication

EP 0866850 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96943547 A

Priority

  • US 9619167 W
  • US 777095 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720034A1] The present invention provides compounds and compositions capable of stimulating plant growth, regeneration of plant cells and tissues, and transformation of plant cells and tissues, comprising mono- and multi-substituted auxinic analogues of indole-3-acetic acid (IAA) comprising substituent groups such as halo-, alkyl-, alkoxy-, acyl-, acylamido- and acyloxy-groups. The invention relates to a method of using such mono- and multi-substituted auxinic analogues of IAA to affect growth, regeneration or transformation in monocotyledonous and dicotyledonous plants, as well as in transgenic plant tissues. The invention also contemplates the use of these auxinic IAA analogues in the presence of other plant growth regulators, such as cytokinin, etc., to enhance plant growth.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/00; C07D 209/04; A01N 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 4/00 (2006.01); A01N 43/38 (2006.01); C07D 209/18 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0025 (2013.01); A01H 4/008 (2013.01); A01N 43/38 (2013.01); C07D 209/18 (2013.01); C12N 15/8201 (2013.01); C12N 15/8205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5188655 A 19930223 - JONES TRAVIS R [US], et al
  • [PA] WO 9634089 A1 19961031 - LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]
  • [XY] K.C. ENGVILD, PHYSIOL. PLANT., vol. 44, 1978, pages 345 - 346, XP002148040
  • [Y] M.M. ALTAMURA ET AL, PHYSIOLOGIA PLANTARIUM, vol. 84, 1992, pages 555 - 560, XP002148041
  • [X] M. BÖTTGER ET AL, PLANTA, vol. 140, 1978, pages 89 - 92, XP002148042
  • [X] T. RASMUSSEN ET AL, J. MAR. BIOTECHNOL., vol. 2, no. 3, 1995, pages 167 - 169, XP002148043
  • [X] D.M. REINECKE ET AL, PHYTOCHEMISTRY, vol. 40, no. 5, 1995, pages 1361 - 1366, XP002148044
  • [X] W.L. PORTER ET AL, PHYTOCHEMISTRY, vol. 4, no. 2, 1965, pages 229 - 243, XP000925921
  • [X] DATABASE CHEMABS CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; XP002148051 & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 19, 7 May 1984, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 156493, XP002148049CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS1984050710019156493 & DATABASE WPI Week 198350, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1983-841263, XP00214805211983501983-841263JPS58189162A
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 61, no. 2, 20 July 1964, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 1822g, XP002148050 & M.N. PREOBRAZHENSKAYA ET AL, ZH. OBSHCH. KHIM., vol. 34, no. 4, 1964, pages 1310 - 1314M.N. PREOBRAZHENSKAYA ET ALZH. OBSHCH. KHIM.196434413101314
  • [X] N. ILIC ET AL, CROAT. CHEM. ACTA, vol. 64, no. 1, 1991, pages 79 - 88, XP002148045
  • [X] A. THOMSON ET AL, NEW PHYTOL., vol. 110, 1988, pages 511 - 515, XP002148046
  • [A] E.S. FERNANDI ET AL, J. LABELLED COMPD. RADIOPHARM., vol. 14, no. 3, 1978, pages 411 - 425, XP000925922
  • [PX] U. RESCHER ET AL, J. PLANT GROWTH REGUL, vol. 15, no. 1, 1996, pages 1-3, XP002148047
  • [PX] B.T.G. LUTZ ET AL, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR STRUCTURE, vol. 382, no. 3, 1996, pages 177 - 185, XP002148048
  • See also references of WO 9720034A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720034 A1 19970605; AU 1276497 A 19970619; EP 0866850 A1 19980930; EP 0866850 A4 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050828

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INVITROGEN CORPORATION

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2000-11-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980624

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980624;LT PAYMENT 980624;LV PAYMENT 980624;RO PAYMENT 980624;SI PAYMENT 980624