Global Patent Index - EP 0866953 A4

EP 0866953 A4 2000-05-24 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING CHARACTERISTICS OF A SAMPLE IN THE PRESENCE OF AMBIENT LIGHT

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING CHARACTERISTICS OF A SAMPLE IN THE PRESENCE OF AMBIENT LIGHT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN DER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER PROBE IN ANWESENHEIT VON UMGEBUNGSLICHT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETERMINATION DES CARACTERISTIQUES D'UN ECHANTILLON EN PRESENCE DE LUMIERE AMBIANTE

Publication

EP 0866953 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96928966 A

Priority

  • US 9613523 W
  • US 263595 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9708523A1] A device (20) determines an optical intensity of light emanating from a sample (22) situated under periodically varying ambient light (34). The device (20) includes a selectively illuminating light source (26a, 26b) that can be switched between on and off states that illuminates the sample (22). A detector (36) detects the optical intensities of the sample (22) a first plurality of times with the effects of the illuminating light source (26a, 26b) to produce a plurality of collective light intensity measurements, and a second plurality of times without the effects of the light source (26a, 26b) to produce a plurality of ambient light intensity measurements. A processor quantitatively determines, based upon the multiple collective intensity measurements and the multiple ambient light intensity measurements, the intensity amount of each of the collective light intensity measurements that results from the illuminating source (26a, 26b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01J 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01J 1/42 (2006.01); G01J 1/44 (2006.01); G01J 3/10 (2006.01); G01J 3/42 (2006.01); G01J 3/44 (2006.01); G01J 3/50 (2006.01); G01N 15/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/03 (2006.01); G01N 21/27 (2006.01); G01N 21/47 (2006.01); G01N 21/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 1/4204 (2013.01); G01J 1/44 (2013.01); G01J 3/10 (2013.01); G01J 3/42 (2013.01); G01J 3/4406 (2013.01); G01J 3/50 (2013.01); G01J 3/501 (2013.01); G01J 3/524 (2013.01); G01J 2001/4242 (2013.01); G01N 2201/1244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9708523 A1 19970306; AU 6853696 A 19970319; AU 738290 B2 20010913; CA 2229458 A1 19970306; EP 0866953 A1 19980930; EP 0866953 A4 20000524; JP H11511557 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100112

2009-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE, LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMERICAN BIOSCIENCE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01J 3/50 A, 7G 01J 1/16 B, 7G 01J 1/44 B

2000-05-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980319

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE