Global Patent Index - EP 0867088 A4

EP 0867088 A4 2000-04-05 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS EMPLOYING VIDEO COMBINING FOR INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS EMPLOYING VIDEO COMBINING FOR INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

VIDEOKOMBINATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG IN INTELLIGENTEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSNEZTWERKEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DES COMBINAISONS D'IMAGES VIDEO DESTINEES A DES RESEAUX DE TRANSPORTS INTELLIGENTS

Publication

EP 0867088 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96942940 A

Priority

  • US 9619639 W
  • US 892795 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9723096A1] A multicamera surveillance system (300) connects video surveillance cameras (104) to a video bridge (310). One or more users (108) in the same or different locations may obtain video from one or more video cameras from this bridge, without having a direct connection to the video cameras. The invention may use graphic combining techniques so that the video inputs may be superimposed on a graphic image, such as a map. The video surveillance cameras may be pannable electronic cameras which provide a user selectable panorama of the scene under surveillance. The inventive system provides a video surveillance system which is simple to understand and use. It also provides a centralized video bridge which may be used to provide a number of monitoring stations to independently view video inputs of interest. Thus, state and local police, EMS dispatch, fire stations, trucking companies, commuters, or any other interested party may be able to view locations of interest using relatively inexpensive equipment, such as a computer and joystick.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/18; G08B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19645 (2013.01); G08B 13/19682 (2013.01); G08B 13/19689 (2013.01); H04N 7/181 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4958297 A 19900918 - HANSEN JAMES K [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
  • See also references of WO 9723096A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9723096 A1 19970626; CA 2242844 A1 19970626; EP 0867088 A1 19980930; EP 0867088 A4 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010703

2000-04-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04N 7/18 A, 7G 08B 15/00 B

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELCORDIA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

1998-12-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOYER, DAVID, GRAY

1998-12-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SMOOT, LANNY, STARKES

1998-10-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980706

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE