Global Patent Index - EP 0867133 B1

EP 0867133 B1 2000-05-17 - Hair clip with profiled teeth

Title (en)

Hair clip with profiled teeth

Title (de)

Haarklip mit profilierten Zähnen

Title (fr)

Pince à cheveux à dents profilées

Publication

EP 0867133 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420048 A

Priority

FR 9704244 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867133A1] The hair clip comprises a first jaw (1) with a series of parallel curved teeth (21-23). It has a second jaw (3) with a second series of curved teeth (41-43). A pivot (5) connects the two jaws enabling their pivoting about an axis (6) between open and closed positions. Certain of the teeth have a width (L2) which is reduced at their base. Certain teeth of the first jaw have a maximum width (L1) in the tooth central zone which decreases towards the base of the tooth in the direction of the tooth free end (19). Certain of the teeth have at their base near their free end (L3) a width equal to at least three times their thickness and in their central zone a width (L1) equal to four times their thickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 8/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 8/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 8/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867133 A1 19980930; EP 0867133 B1 20000517; DE 69800147 D1 20000621; FR 2761242 A1 19981002; FR 2761242 B1 19990507; US 5979467 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800147 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980330

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI