Global Patent Index - EP 0867136 B1

EP 0867136 B1 2002-09-18 - Horizontal sales container for deep-frozen or refrigerated products

Title (en)

Horizontal sales container for deep-frozen or refrigerated products

Title (de)

Horizontales Verkaufsmöbel für tiefgefrorene oder gekühlte Produkte

Title (fr)

Meuble-bac horizontal de vente pour produits surgelés réfrigérés

Publication

EP 0867136 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400733 A

Priority

FR 9703889 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867136A1] The horizontal sales storage unit for deep frozen products comprises a frame (1) the upper peripheral edge of which (2) defines an upwards directed opening. A movable night screen (6) creates a confined atmosphere in the unit when closed. A superstructure (4), suspended by a ceiling, forming a roof above the upper opening has a succession of vertical screens arranged on it. During closing the screens extend between the superstructure and the upper peripheral edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0469 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867136 A1 19980930; EP 0867136 B1 20020918; DE 69807963 D1 20021024; DE 69807963 T2 20030522; ES 2182242 T3 20030301; FR 2761247 A1 19981002; FR 2761247 B1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070327

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040329

2005-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040327

2004-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040327

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182242 T3

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030108

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807963 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011214

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990330

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI