Global Patent Index - EP 0867201 A3

EP 0867201 A3 2000-10-18 - Apparatus for generation of oxygen

Title (en)

Apparatus for generation of oxygen

Title (de)

Gerät zur Erzeugung von Sauerstoff

Title (fr)

Dispositif de génération d'oxygène

Publication

EP 0867201 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98102376 A

Priority

DE 19712276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867201A2] An oxygen generator has a reaction vessel (2), which can be filled with water (13), an O2 generating agent (4) and optionally a catalyst (20), a tightly-fitting cover (3) with an O2 outlet (12) and a bubble detection chamber (16) between the vessel and cover. The novel features are that: (i) the bubble detection chamber is a dish (21') which is (or can be) filled with water; (ii) a device (11, 26, 27, 35) which is permeable to O2 from the reaction vessel but not to water from the dish is placed between the dish and the reaction vessel; and (iii) the cover is transparent, at least over the bubble detection chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 21/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867201 A2 19980930; EP 0867201 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI