Global Patent Index - EP 0867225 A3

EP 0867225 A3 2000-12-20 - Method and apparatus for controlling electric dust collector

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling electric dust collector

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer elektrischen Staubsammelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour commander un capteur de poussière électrique

Publication

EP 0867225 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301634 A

Priority

JP 8877597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867225A2] When it is judged that an abnormality occurs to an electric dust collector (1) in step S2, it is then judged whether the abnormality intermittently occurs a predetermined plurality of times or more within a predetermined second measuring time in step S3. If the judgment in step S3 is affirmative, the supply of high voltage electric current to one pair of opposing electrodes ofthe electric dust collector (1) is temporarily stopped in step S5, and after the passage of a first standby time, the supply of high voltage electric current to the one pair of opposing electrodes is resumed in step S7. If the judgment in step S2 is negative, it is judged whether or not the abnormality of the electric dust collector (1) is continued during a predetermined first measuring time in step S3. If the judgment in step S3 is affirmative, an abnormal time procedure is carried out with respect to the electric dust collector 1 in step S4. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/72 (2006.01); B03C 3/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 19511442 C1 19960307 - BABCOCK ANLAGEN GMBH [DE]
  • [X] US 3772853 A 19731120 - BURGE J, et al
  • [A] EP 0576069 A1 19931229 - METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 86 (C - 916) 3 March 1992 (1992-03-03)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 248 (C - 193) 4 November 1983 (1983-11-04)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 54 (C - 909) 12 February 1992 (1992-02-12)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867225 A2 19980930; EP 0867225 A3 20001220; JP 3210595 B2 20010917; JP H10263435 A 19981006

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI