Global Patent Index - EP 0867279 B1

EP 0867279 B1 2000-11-15 - Printing apparatus

Title (en)

Printing apparatus

Title (de)

Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0867279 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98105664 A

Priority

JP 9502397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867279A1] A printing apparatus for printing printing- papers with plates is provided with two plate cylinders (11;12), two blanket cylinders (13;14) coming into contact with the plate cylinders respectively, one impression cylinder (15) coming into contact with these blanket cylinders, an image recording part (25) for recording images on the plates on a prescribed image recording position, and a mechanism (31;32) for moving the two plate cylinders between the image recording position and printing positions respectively. Thus, the image recording part and a mechanism for feeding inks to the plates can be arranged on separate positions not interfering with each other, and a space for arranging these members can be readily ensured. Further, it is possible to record images on plates held on first and second plate cylinders with a single image recording part, whereby the printing apparatus can be simplified and the cost for the overall apparatus can be suppressed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/18 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2013.01); B41P 2217/13 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867279 A1 19980930; EP 0867279 B1 20001115; EP 0867279 B2 20051123; DE 69800395 D1 20001221; DE 69800395 T2 20010621; DE 69800395 T3 20060803; JP 3466867 B2 20031117; JP H10272756 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800395

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69800395

- Representative's name: KILIAN KILIAN & PARTNER, DE

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120327

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800395 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981120

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI