Global Patent Index - EP 0867361 A3

EP 0867361 A3 2000-04-12 - Nautical propulsor with ducted rotor propeller

Title (en)

Nautical propulsor with ducted rotor propeller

Title (de)

Schiffsantrieb mit Düsenpropeller

Title (fr)

Propulseur de bâteau avec une hélice tournant dans une tuyère

Publication

EP 0867361 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830151 A

Priority

IT RM970154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867361A2] This invention relates to a nautical propulsor comprising a shell (1) in which one or more propellers (2) are ducted, said shell (1) being rigidly connected to an axle (5), said propellers (2) being rotatively associated to said shell (1) by suitable coupling means and each of said propellers (2) having the rotor member (18) of a corresponding rotary electric motor associated thereto, the stator member (19) of said electric motor being rigidly connected to said shell (1), so that the rotation of said propellers (2) is rigidly coupled to the rotation of the corresponding rotor member (18), said rotor members (18) and associated stator members (19) being internally housed in the structure of said shell (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 5/14; B63H 1/16; B63H 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 5/10 (2006.01); B63H 5/14 (2006.01); B63H 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 5/125 (2013.01); B63H 5/10 (2013.01); B63H 5/14 (2013.01); B63H 23/24 (2013.01); B63H 2005/1258 (2013.01); B63H 2023/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867361 A2 19980930; EP 0867361 A3 20000412; IT 1291858 B1 19990121; IT RM970154 A1 19980921

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63H 5/14 A, 7B 63H 23/24 B, 7B 63H 1/16 B

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI