Global patent index - EP 0867401 B1

EP 0867401 B1 2000-02-02 - Spout arrangement for emptying containers, drums in particular

Title (en)

Spout arrangement for emptying containers, drums in particular

Title (de)

Auslaufvorrichtung zum Entleeren von Behältern, insbesondere Fässern

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'écoulement pour la vidange de conteneurs, en particulier de fûts

Publication

EP 0867401 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104112 A

Priority

DE 29705629 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867401A1] The draining device has a drain aperture (2) at the bottom, in which a fluid-tight auxiliary drain (3) can be inserted, with a cap (4), the upper part of which has a bulge in the direction of the flow, and the lower part a fluid entry aperture (6). The auxiliary drain has a drain connected (7) joined to the cap. This connector projects beyond the outside of the barrel. Its cross section is basically the same as that of the drain aperture. This projection may be in the form of a convex moulding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/08; B67D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 7/06 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/06 (2013.01); B67D 1/08 (2013.01); B67D 1/0807 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705629 U1 19970807; EP 0867401 A1 19980930; EP 0867401 B1 20000202; ES 2143325 T3 20000501

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20040603

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-03-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050307

2004-12-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-03-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040307

2004-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PROTECHNA S.A.

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143325

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-26 [K2C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT SPECIFICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K2C1

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-04-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2000-03-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000324

- Year of fee payment: 3

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

1999-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990602

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IE IT

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990130

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IE IT

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI