Global Patent Index - EP 0867527 B1

EP 0867527 B1 2001-03-21 - Electrode with catalytic coating for electrochemical processes and manufacture thereof

Title (en)

Electrode with catalytic coating for electrochemical processes and manufacture thereof

Title (de)

Elektrode mit katalytischer Beschichtung für elektrochemische Prozesse und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Electrode à recouvrement catalytique pour des processus électrochimiques et procédé de fabrication de celle-ci

Publication

EP 0867527 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98500019 A

Priority

ES 9700419 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867527A1] Catalyst-coated electrodes are claimed for use in electrochemical processes such as chlor-alkali electrolysis, sodium chlorate and hypochlorite production, electrodeposition of metals and manganese dioxide, impressed current cathodic protection, electrochemical organic synthesis, etc. The electrode has an electrolyte-resistant conductive metal substrate with a catalytic coating in the form of superposed layers of different compositions containing a valve metal oxide and at least two platinum group metal oxides. The proportion of platinum group metal oxides wrt. the valve metal oxide increases progressively from the first layer, with a constant molar platinum group metal oxide ratio, up to an external layer which contains only platinum group metal oxides. Also claimed is a process for making the above electrode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/04 (2006.01); C25B 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 11/0484 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867527 A1 19980930; EP 0867527 B1 20010321; DZ 2435 A1 20030111

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-03-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050303

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19981005

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000424

1999-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR LI

1999-06-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19981005

1999-05-12 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19980930

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981005

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI