Global Patent Index - EP 0867541 B1

EP 0867541 B1 2000-03-01 - Method for making a plied yarn in a combined spinning-twisting process

Title (en)

Method for making a plied yarn in a combined spinning-twisting process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zwirns in einem kombinierten Spinn-Zwirn-prozess

Title (fr)

Procédé pour fabriquer un fil retors dans un processus combiné de filature et retordage

Publication

EP 0867541 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97104482 A

Priority

EP 97104482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867541A1] To produce a twisted yarn, in a combined spinning/twisting process, at least two spinners (52,53) each deliver spun yarns (a,a') which are fed to a centering point on the axis of a two-for-one twister. They are twisted initially in one direction to pass to a second centering point to be given an opposed twist. They pass through the second centering point within a yarn balloon between the centering points to be wound on to a bobbin (22) with is rotated within the yarn balloon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 7/90; D01H 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/10 (2006.01); D01H 4/08 (2006.01); D01H 7/86 (2006.01); D01H 7/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/90 (2013.01); D01H 1/103 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867541 A1 19980930; EP 0867541 B1 20000301; CZ 9800782 A3 19980916; DE 59701171 D1 20000406; TR 9800404 A2 19981021; US 5964083 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-04-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOLKMANN GMBH

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: VOLKMANN GMBH & CO. TRANSFER- VOLKMANN GMBH

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701171 20000406

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970927

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI