Global patent index - EP 0867570 B1

EP 0867570 B1 2000-08-02 - Flushing cistern for recessed mounting operated at the top or at the front

Title (en)

Flushing cistern for recessed mounting operated at the top or at the front

Title (de)

Einbauspülkasten zur Top- oder Frontbetätigung

Title (fr)

Réservoir de chasse à encastrer à commande par le dessus ou en façade

Publication

EP 0867570 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400683 A

Priority

EP 97400683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867570A1] The cistern has a reservoir (2) in which a tappet actuated valve mechanism (15,16,20) is sensitive to the movement of a press panel (11). This moves in an aperture (5a) formed in the upper face of the reservoir. A further opening (5b) is formed in the face of the reservoir. The actuating mechanism is mounted in one of the two openings. The openings can be formed by parts of the same cut out (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/012; E03D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01); E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/0125 (2013.01); E03D 11/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867570 A1 19980930; EP 0867570 B1 20000802; DE 69702696 D1 20000907; DE 69702696 T2 20010412

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090326

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-12-18 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RG

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ALLIA

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-17 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: GC

2002-12-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2002-10-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG

2001-06-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALLIA (S.A.)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2000-10-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALLIA (S.A.)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702696

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR IT LI NL

1999-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990303

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL