Global patent index - EP 0867658 B1

EP 0867658 B1 2000-11-29 - Process and device for combustion of liquid fuel

Title (en)

Process and device for combustion of liquid fuel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbrennung von flüssigem Brennstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la combustion d'un combustible liquide

Publication

EP 0867658 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810247 A

Priority

CH 71897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867658A1] Liquid fuel is sprayed into the flame tube (15) of an oil burner in front of the flame root (77), entering returning flue gas and evaporating there. Flue gas enriched with the fuel is mixed in a turbulent manner with air (71). The air is preferably injected into the flame tube through a central orifice (29) in a baffle disc (13) and the flue gas enters at the disc end of the flame tube so that it sheathes (67) the central air stream (69). Also claimed is an oil burner with flue gas recirculation in which the spray orifice (21) of the fuel nozzle (23) is in the plane of the baffle disc producing low pressure and the disc has a ring-shaped air inlet around the fuel nozzle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 9/00; F23D 11/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23D 11/40 (2013.01); F23C 2202/20 (2013.01); F23C 2900/03006 (2013.01); F23D 2207/00 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11402 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11403 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867658 A1 19980930; EP 0867658 B1 20001129; AT 197844 T 20001215; DE 59800350 D1 20010104; ES 2154491 T3 20010401

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-03-15 [REG AT NFJG] REINSTATEMENT AFTER LATE PAYMENT OF ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: NFJG

- Ref Document Number: 197844

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140205

2014-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SWISS E-TECHNIC AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 197844

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140205

2013-09-05 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R074

- Ref Document Number: 59800350

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130711

2013-09-05 [REG DE R074] RE-ESTABLISHMENT ALLOWED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R074

- Ref Document Number: 59800350

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130714

2013-07-31 [PGRI AT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20130620

2013-06-21 [REG DE R073] RE-ESTABLISHMENT REQUESTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R073

- Ref Document Number: 59800350

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120323

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800350

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 197844

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120323

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060324

2007-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROSENICH PAUL; GISLER CHRISTIAN PATENTBUERO PAUL R

2007-02-28 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PK

- Free Format Text: DER BESTELLTE VERTRETER WURDE AUFGRUND DES HAENGIGEN KONKURSVERFAHRENS GELOESCHT, NEU WURDE DER GESETZLICHE VERTRETER EINGETRAGEN.

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060323

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-03-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060323

2006-03-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060323

2005-04-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050415

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VERFAHRENSTECHNIK FUR HEIZUNG VTH A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154491

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-03-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-03-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-02-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800350

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990330;LT PAYMENT 19990330;LV PAYMENT 19990330;RO PAYMENT 19990330;SI PAYMENT 19990330

2000-11-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197844

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000223

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

1999-06-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990330;LT PAYMENT 19990330;LV PAYMENT 19990330;RO PAYMENT 19990330;SI PAYMENT 19990330

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990330

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI