Global Patent Index - EP 0867661 A3

EP 0867661 A3 2000-05-24 - Flame monitoring device with flame rod

Title (en)

Flame monitoring device with flame rod

Title (de)

Flammenwächter mit Flammenstab

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance de flamme avec électrode d'ionisation

Publication

EP 0867661 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105254 A

Priority

DE 19712938 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19712938C1] The circuit has a frequency multiplier circuit (D1-D4) supplied from two phase lines (PH1,PH2) of the AC network supply and supplying the flame rod (FR) of the flame monitor (FA) via a capacitor (C). One of the phase lines (PH2) acts as a reference potential line for the flame monitor, the frequency multiplier circuit provided by a diode bridge circuit and a threshold stage reducing the output voltage to zero when it is below a given threshold value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19712938 C1 19980514; DE 59805467 D1 20021017; EP 0867661 A2 19980930; EP 0867661 A3 20000524; EP 0867661 B1 20020911; ES 2179394 T3 20030116

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130324

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805467

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130324

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090325

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-11-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080403

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL

- Effective date: 20080618

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179394 T3

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805467 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI