Global Patent Index - EP 0867665 A3

EP 0867665 A3 2000-04-12 - Method to improve air circulation in a clean air cabine

Title (en)

Method to improve air circulation in a clean air cabine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Optimierung der Luftführung in einer Reinluft-Kabine

Title (fr)

Méthode pour améliorer la circulation d'air dans une cabine d'air propre

Publication

EP 0867665 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105609 A

Priority

DE 19712975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867665A2] The clean air cabin is equipped with a feed installation for additional clean air producing a clean air cushion directly over the work surface (10) of the work plate (9). The work plate is sieve-shaped. The area of the lower surface (11) of the work plate turned away from the work surface is formed as a trough component (8) sealed against the atmosphere and in it issues at lease one conduit (19,19') feeding clean air. In at least one edge area of the work plate at least one conduit feeding clean air is arranged, which in specific sections has outflow apertures, which steer the emerging clean air against a product on the work surface. In the area of the work plate on at least one clean air cabin wall at least one upwardly directed nozzle (33) is arranged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00; F24F 3/16; F24F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/02 (2006.01); F24F 3/16 (2006.01); F24F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 15/023 (2013.01); F24F 3/1607 (2013.01); F24F 9/00 (2013.01); B08B 2215/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867665 A2 19980930; EP 0867665 A3 20000412; DE 19712975 A1 19981001

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021002

2003-04-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 1/00 A, 7F 24F 3/16 B, 7F 24F 9/00 B

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI