Global Patent Index - EP 0867840 A3

EP 0867840 A3 2000-09-27 - Franking machine with flexible user interface

Title (en)

Franking machine with flexible user interface

Title (de)

Frankierautomat mit flexibler Benutzeroberfläche

Title (fr)

Machine à affranchir avec interface utilisateur flexible

Publication

EP 0867840 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250224 A

Priority

  • DE 4217478 A
  • EP 93250146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0571061A2] An arrangement (10) for generating a flexible user interface for automatic franking machines having input/output and control means (1, 3 and 5) exhibits user guidance with predetermination of the most frequent input functions in accordance with a display structure by a processor system (11) for a first representation. This first level can be left during the user guidance, which identifies the input functions step by step in the fields of the display means (3) and can predetermine other levels or operating steps in the fields. A normal/adaptive and/or auto-adaptive configuration of the functions in the display structure can be selected for the user guidance. The input means (1) are used for adjusting parameters via a selection from a table and forwarding in a number of input functions which can be called up. In addition, elements for calling up input functions, for switching back into the first level and for switching between levels are provided in order to call up little-used input functions more quickly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04; G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00298 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0571061 A2 19931124; EP 0571061 A3 19950531; EP 0571061 B1 19990107; DE 4217478 A1 19931125; DE 59310392 D1 20071122; EP 0867840 A2 19980930; EP 0867840 A3 20000927; EP 0867840 B1 20071010

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100519

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071219

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310392 P 20071122

2007-10-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-10-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0571061 P

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/04 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

1998-09-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 571061

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI