Global Patent Index - EP 0867894 B1

EP 0867894 B1 2001-12-05 - Cable-twist manufacturing device

Title (en)

Cable-twist manufacturing device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Kabelverseilung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fabrication d'un câblage toronné

Publication

EP 0867894 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97890060 A

Priority

  • EP 97890060 A
  • AT 49396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867894A1] An installation is for the manufacture of a cable rope from single wires (1) and incorporates several rotating storage disks (4) which are equipped with bores (10, 11). The disks (4) are located between a rope disk (5) driven with alternating directions, and a guide disk (3) which is stationary and located on the wire inlet side. The storage disks (4) can rotate freely in their bearings (9) and each disk features a stop (13, 14) to provide for a differential angle defining in relation to the neighbouring disk (3, 4,5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/0257 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867894 A1 19980930; EP 0867894 B1 20011205; AT 403173 B 19971125; AT A49396 A 19970415; DE 59705666 D1 20020117; ES 2168599 T3 20020616; PT 867894 E 20020531; SI 0867894 T1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120328

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705666

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120327

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120327

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59705666

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-09-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060927

2005-03-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168599 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705666 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980219

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENDAHL MASCHINEN GMBH

2001-09-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SEIBERT, GERHARD

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000317

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19980219

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990206

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI PAYMENT 980219