Global Patent Index - EP 0867898 B1

EP 0867898 B1 2002-11-27 - Electromagnetic positioning device

Title (en)

Electromagnetic positioning device

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisch arbeitende Stelleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif électromagnétique de positionnement

Publication

EP 0867898 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100775 A

Priority

DE 19712293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867898A1] The electromagnetic setting device has a pair of relatively spaced magnetic systems , each having an energising coil (3, 23) for displacement of a magnetic armature (17) between 2 switch positions. The magnetic armature is acted on by 2 opposing springs (11, 21), the energising coils connected in series or parallel, with a single magnetic system associated with a permanent magnet (71).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/16; F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 7/1646 (2013.01); H01F 7/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867898 A1 19980930; EP 0867898 B1 20021127; AT 228712 T 20021215; DE 19712293 A1 19981001; ES 2186928 T3 20030516; PT 867898 E 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170118

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170117

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-10-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170929

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806390

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160118

2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160718

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-10-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228712 T

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KENDRION (VILLINGEN) GMBH

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-01-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KENDRION (VILLINGEN) GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 228712 T

- Effective date: 20121128

2012-12-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20121114

2012-12-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KENDRION GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121114

2012-11-21 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-10-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KENDRION (VILLINGEN) GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KENDRION BINDER MAGNETE GMBH, 78048 VILLINGEN-SCHWENNINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59806390

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-10-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806390

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WESTPHAL MUSSGNUG & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-10-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806390

- Representative's name: WESTPHAL, MUSSGNUG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MI, DE

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806390

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WESTPHAL MUSSGNUG & PARTNER, DE

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186928 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806390 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228712 T 20021215

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KENDRION BINDER MAGNETE GMBH

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990219

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981230

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI