Global patent index - EP 0867914 B1

EP 0867914 B1 2000-09-20 - Mercury vapour discharge lamp including an amalgam

Title (en)

Mercury vapour discharge lamp including an amalgam

Title (de)

Quecksilberdampf-Entladungslampe mit einem Amalgam

Title (fr)

Lampe à dècharge à vapeur de mercure contenant un amalgame

Publication

EP 0867914 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98302183 A

Priority

GB 9706399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0867914A1] A mercury discharge lamp includes an amalgam for controlling the mercury vapour pressure within the lamp, the amalgam being selected and positioned within the lamp to provide a substantially optimum vapour pressure of mercury at the temperature of the amalgam corresponding to the maximum rated operating power of the lamp. The optimum vapour pressure is close to a minimum (B) at the temperature corresponding to maximum operating power, and adjacent a region (D) of steeply rising mercury vapour pressure with falling temperature. By operating the lamp in this region, a reduction in the operating power of the lamp causes a fall in temperature and hence an increase in the vapour pressure of the mercury to effect dimming of the lamp. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/28; C22C 7/00; C22C 13/00; H01J 61/12; H01J 61/20; H01J 61/70; H01J 61/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 7/00 (2006.01); H01J 61/20 (2006.01); H01J 61/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/20 (2013.01); C22C 7/00 (2013.01); H01J 61/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0867914 A1 19980930; EP 0867914 B1 20000920; DE 69800314 D1 20001026; DE 69800314 T2 20010426; GB 2323701 A 19980930; GB 9706399 D0 19970514; JP H113681 A 19990106

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2005-03-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-26

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991130

1999-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990330

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI