Global Patent Index - EP 0868109 B1

EP 0868109 B1 2003-06-18 - Circuit for assigning power-control signals to hot-plates

Title (en)

Circuit for assigning power-control signals to hot-plates

Title (de)

Schaltung zur Zuordnung von Leistungssteuersignalen zu Kochstellen

Title (fr)

Circuit pour assigner des signals de contrôle de puissance à des plaques de cuisson

Publication

EP 0868109 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98104447 A

Priority

DE 19713315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0868109A2] The circuit associates the power control signals from drive electronics with the cooking positions (1-4) of a cooker hob. The possible associations are stored in an electronic memory (20) under addresses and the memory can be addressed using a control panel (22). The addressing is performed in such a way that the desired association is activated according to the selected address. At least one cooking point is connected to a relay (5,6). The appropriate control signal is switched to the relay via logic (7,8) using the association.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 1/02; H05B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 1/0266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0868109 A2 19980930; EP 0868109 A3 19981111; EP 0868109 B1 20030618; DE 19713315 A1 19981001; DE 19713315 C2 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-05-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808728 P 20030724

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2003-06-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

1999-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI NL

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981013

1998-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-09-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

1998-09-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI