Global Patent Index - EP 0868128 B1

EP 0868128 B1 2000-01-26 - HANDLE FOR A STICK

Title (en)

HANDLE FOR A STICK

Title (de)

STOCKGRIFF

Title (fr)

POIGNEE DE BATON

Publication

EP 0868128 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96937234 A

Priority

  • DE 29520269 U
  • EP 9604643 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632718A1] The hand loop (16) of strip material (50) is mounted in the top end of the grip (12), being adjustable for length and lockable inside the grip by a clamp (20) round which it passes. A locking member (22) adjustable from the outside and extending in the axial direction of the stick passes through the loop and clamping member (28), and is adjustable in a guiding screwthread (27). The actuating member (24) turns in the grip with the coaxial locking member (22) but slides in the axial direction. The actuating member can be a plain washer through which the head of a screw forming the locking member passes. The washer can be flush with the grip surface, and can have a knurled outer edge. The guiding screwthread can be in a metal insert enclosed in a plastic bush, which is a press-fit in the grip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 9/02; A63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 9/02 (2006.01); A63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 9/02 (2013.01); A63C 11/222 (2013.01); A45B 2009/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29520269 U1 19960307; AT 189104 T 20000215; DE 19632718 A1 19970703; DE 19632718 C2 19980702; EP 0868128 A1 19981007; EP 0868128 B1 20000126; JP 2000502272 A 20000229; US 6139060 A 20001031; WO 9723146 A1 19970703

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041025

2003-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-06-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARDIN & CIE S.A.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604333 20000302

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189104 T 20000215

2000-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LENHART, KLAUS

2000-01-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LENHART, KLAUS

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990127

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980211

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI