Global Patent Index - EP 0868221 B1

EP 0868221 B1 2000-08-02 - PRECOMPRESSION PUMP FORMED WITHIN THE PUSHER ELEMENT

Title (en)

PRECOMPRESSION PUMP FORMED WITHIN THE PUSHER ELEMENT

Title (de)

IN DRUCKTASTE EINGEBAUTE VORDRUCKPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A PRECOMPRESSION FORMEE DANS LE POUSSOIR

Publication

EP 0868221 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96941079 A

Priority

  • FR 9601895 W
  • FR 9515320 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9723304A1] Precompression pump intended to dispense selectively a product contained in a container, said pump comprising a pump chamber (3) having an inlet valve (4), a piston (1) sliding in a first cylinder (2), a differential piston (5) forming an outlet valve of said pump chamber (3) and sliding in a second cylinder (11) between a closing position and an opening position of the pump chamber (3), said pump comprising also a pusher (6) provided with a dispensing orifice (7), said pusher element (6) being movable between a rest position and a pump actuation position, the pump being characterized in that said first and second cylinders (2 and 11) are directly formed by first and second respective internal walls of said pusher (6), the latter delimiting partially said pump chamber (3), the pump being also characterized in that it comprises only one spring (15) bearing on one side on a portion of the pusher (6) and on the other side on a portion of the differential piston (5), said spring (15) acting on the one hand as a return spring for the pusher (6) towards its rest position and on the other hand as a precompression spring for the differential piston (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3007 (2013.01); B05B 11/3004 (2013.01); B05B 11/304 (2013.01); B05B 11/3074 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9723304 A1 19970703; DE 69609628 D1 20000907; DE 69609628 T2 20010412; EP 0868221 A1 19981007; EP 0868221 B1 20000802; ES 2151189 T3 20001216; FR 2742812 A1 19970627; FR 2742812 B1 19980220; US 6012615 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071129

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071129

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071129

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151189 T3

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-10-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609628 20000907

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRUNET, MICHEL

2000-06-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DE POUS, OLIVIER

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991116

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980720

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT