Global Patent Index - EP 0868235 B1

EP 0868235 B1 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING A ONE-PIECE METAL VEHICLE WHEEL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FABRICATING A ONE-PIECE METAL VEHICLE WHEEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EINTEILIGEN METALLFAHRZEUGRADES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE ROUE METALLIQUE DE VEHICULE D'UNE SEULE PIECE

Publication

EP 0868235 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96943272 A

Priority

  • IB 9601489 W
  • US 56493995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9719771A1] An improved method for fabricating a vehicle wheel (2) from a one-piece sheet metal blank (10) involves a nine station transfer die. In a first station, a sheet metal blank is drawn into a dish-shaped wall (12), a cylindrical outside wall (14), a first contour (16), and a first side wall (18). In the second station, the dish-shaped wall is reverse drawn to form a hub (22) and an inside wall (10), and a valve hole (24) is punched into the first contour. In the third station, the hub is flattened to be substantially perpendicular to an axial centerline of the partially fabricated wheel, and an outer peripheral edge of the first side wall is trimmed. In the fourth station, the inside wall is laterally formed so as to be in contact with the outside wall, and an outer peripheral edge of the first side wall is wiped over to form a flange. In the fifth station, a second contour is laterally formed. In the sixth station, a first offset and inner and outer hub-stiffening embosses are drawn into the hub. In the seventh station, a second offset is drawn in the hub, and a second side wall is laterally formed to complete a tire engaging rim. In the eighth station a center aperture and a plurality of wheel mounting holes are punched in the hub. Finally, in the ninth station, the center aperture and the wheel mounting holes are extruded, and a plurality of rim-stiffening embosses are laterally formed in the rim.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/26 (2006.01); B60B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60B 3/02 (2013.01); B21D 53/264 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49503 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49529 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9719771 A1 19970605; AT 223768 T 20020915; AU 1205997 A 19970619; BR 9611662 A 19991228; DE 69623645 D1 20021017; DE 69623645 T2 20030515; EP 0868235 A1 19981007; EP 0868235 B1 20020911; ES 2183988 T3 20030401; JP 2001507628 A 20010612; MX 9804216 A 19981031; US 5664329 A 19970909

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051127

2005-07-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041127

2005-07-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041128

2004-11-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041127

2004-11-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041127

2004-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031105

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183988 T3

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623645 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223768 T 20020915

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991028

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980519

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE