Global Patent Index - EP 0868238 B1

EP 0868238 B1 2001-05-30 - CONTINUOUS CASTING DIE

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS CASTING DIE

Title (de)

STRANGGIESSKOKILLE

Title (fr)

COQUILLE DE COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 0868238 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96941052 A

Priority

  • EP 9605284 W
  • LU 88689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9723317A1] A continuous casting die has a casting channel (10) formed by moulding plates (12) and a self-carrying frame construction with lateral openings into which the moulding plates (12) can be slidingly inserted perpendicularly to the casting channel. The frame construction preferably has a top frame (14) with a passage (16) which is slightly larger than the cross-section of the casting channel (10) at the entrance of the casting die, a bottom frame (18) with a passage (20) which is slightly larger than the cross-section of the casting channel (10) at the exit of the casting die, and corner sections (22) which link the top frame (14) to the bottom frame (18). The lateral passages are delimited at their sides by the two corner sections, above by the top frame (14) and below by the bottom frame (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/041 (2006.01); B22D 11/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2013.01); B22D 11/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9723317 A1 19970703; AT 201621 T 20010615; AU 1032697 A 19970717; DE 59607018 D1 20010705; DK 0868238 T3 20010716; EP 0868238 A1 19981007; EP 0868238 B1 20010530; ES 2157016 T3 20010801; LU 88689 A1 19970622; TW 333481 B 19980611; US 6158496 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051129

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031213

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PAUL *WURTH

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-12-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20011207

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-02 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011101

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157016 T3

2001-07-16 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59607018 20010705

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201621 T 20010615

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991122

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980602

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE