Global patent index - EP 0868305 B1

EP 0868305 B1 2000-03-29 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING THE AMOUNT OF A FLUID SPRAYED ACROSS THE WIDTH OF MOVING MATERIAL WEBS FOR THE MOISTENING THEREOF

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MONITORING THE AMOUNT OF A FLUID SPRAYED ACROSS THE WIDTH OF MOVING MATERIAL WEBS FOR THE MOISTENING THEREOF

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER SPRÜHMENGE EINER ZUR BEFEUCHTUNG BEWEGTER MATERIALBAHNEN IN DIE BREITE VERSPRÜHTEN FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA QUANTITE DE LIQUIDE PULVERISE, DANS LE SENS DE LA LARGEUR, POUR HUMIDIFIER UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU EN MOUVEMENT

Publication

EP 0868305 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96939828 A

Priority

  • DE 19546260 A
  • EP 9605043 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546260C1] The invention relates to a method for monitoring the amount of a fluid sprayed across the width of moving webs of material for the moistening thereof. To monitor the fluid sprayed across the width in a simple and reliable manner and to detect faulty operation early on, it is proposed that a local stream of droplets is measured for each individual measuring zone of the sprayed fluid, the measured values of the local droplet stream are stored as desired values, and the local streams of droplets are determined again and each compared with the predetermined desired value of the associated measuring zone. The invention also relates to a device for carrying out said method, wherein a counting device for the registration of droplets (to be recorded in each individual measuring zone) of the sprayed fluid can be moved into positions allocated to the measuring zones, and a signal can be generated by the counting device for each registered droplet, and can be transmitted to an evaluation unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 12/08 (2006.01); B41F 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/02 (2013.01); B05B 12/082 (2013.01); Y10S 101/45 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546260 C1 19961121; DE 59604852 D1 20000504; EP 0868305 A1 19981007; EP 0868305 B1 20000329; JP 2000501663 A 20000215; US 6016751 A 20000125; WO 9721544 A1 19970619

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051116

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WEITMANN & KONRAD G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ARDIN & CIE S.A.

2000-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990126

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980409

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE