Global Patent Index - EP 0868355 B1

EP 0868355 B1 2000-02-16 - TIN FOR FOODSTUFFS

Title (en)

TIN FOR FOODSTUFFS

Title (de)

KONSERVENDOSENKÖRPER

Title (fr)

CORPS DE BOITE A CONSERVES

Publication

EP 0868355 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942344 A

Priority

  • DE 29519105 U
  • EP 9605414 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ294837B6] The present invention relates to a tin for foodstuffs, the tin comprising a base (10) and a peripheral wall (20) which projects from the base and surrounds an inner space (30). The upper edge of the wall delimits all around an opening (31) in the inner space (30), the inner space (30) widening conically upwards and the wall (20), which surrounds this inner space (30), merging at the bottom into the base (10) at a rounded portion (21). The merging region is designed such that a peripheral annular bearing line (11) is produced but, on the interior, the base (10) is first further extended upwards and then a bearing surface (16) between 1.5 and 10 mm wide is produced by a downwardly projecting peripheral annular bead (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/12 (2006.01); B65D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/12 (2013.01); B65D 1/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29519105 U1 19960118; AT 189795 T 20000315; AU 1176697 A 19970627; CZ 294837 B6 20050316; CZ 9801575 A3 19990811; EE 9800167 A 19981215; EP 0868355 A1 19981007; EP 0868355 B1 20000216; ES 2143797 T3 20000516; GR 3033121 T3 20000831; HU 0103599 A2 20020228; HU 0103599 A3 20020429; HU 226126 B1 20080428; IS 4746 A 19980515; NO 321953 B1 20060731; NO 982537 A 19980804; NO 982537 D0 19980603; PL 185149 B1 20030331; PL 327012 A1 19981109; PT 868355 E 20000831; WO 9720741 A1 19970612

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111205

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111204

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189795 T

- Effective date: 20111204

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111204

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604469

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IMPRESS METAL PACKAGING G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20111231

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101204

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110715

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101204

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110616

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101204

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110610

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091205

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2010-09-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-08-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081204

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100316

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090703

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-05-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143797 T3

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604469 20000323

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 19980603

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189795 T 20000315

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1998-12-02 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 980603

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980603

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE