Global Patent Index - EP 0868380 B1

EP 0868380 B1 2000-05-24 - DEVICE FOR APPLYING AN ADHESIVE MOUNTING STRIP

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR APPLYING AN ADHESIVE MOUNTING STRIP

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON KLEBENDEM MONTAGEBAND

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER UNE BANDE DE FIXATION ADHESIVE

Publication

EP 0868380 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96943959 A

Priority

  • DE 19546581 A
  • EP 9605620 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19546581A1] A device for applying an adhesive mounting strip (1) from a roller (2) for mounting elements on wall, floor or ceiling sections, in particular on the transition between floor and wall, has a handle (3), a laying element (4) for the mounting strip (1) and a holder (18) for the roller (2) for unwinding the mounting strip (1) arranged on a support (10). The laying element (4) has at least on one side a laying edge (7) with a radius designed in such a way that the adhesive mounting strip (1) supplied without contact with the free adhesive surface can be glued into inner corners.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/00 (2006.01); B65H 35/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0033 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1795 (2013.01); Y10T 156/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19546581 A1 19970619; DE 19546581 C2 20000120; AT 193271 T 20000615; AU 1372397 A 19970703; CN 1071280 C 20010919; CN 1204296 A 19990106; DK 0868380 T3 20000828; EP 0868380 A1 19981007; EP 0868380 B1 20000524; US 6029729 A 20000229; US 6386261 B1 20020514; WO 9721619 A1 19970619

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 193271 T

- Effective date: 20161213

2016-12-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605326

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141213

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141213

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-07-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59605326

- Representative's name: SPRANGER + BURGER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121213

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20111221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: UZIN TYRO AG

- Free text: UZIN TYRO AG#ENNETBUERGERSTRASSE 47#6374 BUOCHS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- UZIN TYRO AG#ENNETBUERGERSTRASSE 47#6374 BUOCHS (CH)

2005-10-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-05-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: UZIN TYRO AG

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-03-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: VERTRETER WURDE IRRTUEMLICH ERFASST

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: M. ZARDI & CO.

2005-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: UZIN TYRO AG

- Free text: SILU VERWALTUNG AG#C/O RIGITREUHAND AG, HUOBMATTSTRASSE 7#CH-6045 MEGGEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- UZIN TYRO AG#ENNETBUERGERSTRASSE 47#6374 BUOCHS (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605326 20000629

2000-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193271 T 20000615

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990211

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980525

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL SE