Global Patent Index - EP 0868382 B1

EP 0868382 B1 2000-05-03 - METHOD FOR MONITORING SCANNING CONDITIONS DURING CONTROL OF A YARN FEEDER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MONITORING SCANNING CONDITIONS DURING CONTROL OF A YARN FEEDER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN DER ABTASTVERHÄLTNISSE BEIM STEUERN EINER FADENLIEFERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DES CONDITIONS D'EXPLORATION PENDANT L'OPERATION DE COMMANDE D'UN FOURNISSEUR DE FIL

Publication

EP 0868382 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942317 A

Priority

  • DE 19545891 A
  • EP 9605383 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19545891A1] The invention relates to a method for monitoring scanning conditions during control of a yarn feeder which has a storage surface (2) for the yarn (Y), a drive motor (15), a sensor device (7) with at least one sensor (S) aligned on a scanning zone (12) in the yarn feeder (F), and a control circuit (L) connected thereto. The sensor (S) produces an output object signal for control purposes in relation to the movement and the presence or absence of an object in the scanning zone (12), and the signal level depends on the quality of the scanning conditions. An alarm signal can also be produced when the scanning conditions deteriorate. During said method a substantially synchronous test signal is reproduced from the output object signal, the signal level of the test signal is compared with an alarm threshold value representing a deterioration in the scanning conditions which is still permissible, and finally the alarm signal is produced when the level of the test signal falls below the alarm threshold value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/486 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19545891 A1 19970612; CN 1103734 C 20030326; CN 1207083 A 19990203; EP 0868382 A1 19981007; EP 0868382 B1 20000503; TW 308614 B 19970621; US 6125663 A 20001003; WO 9721620 A1 19970619

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605149

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEMMINGER-IRO G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEMMINGER-IRO G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041204

2003-12-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-12-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605149 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

2000-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990506

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE