Global Patent Index - EP 0868571 B1

EP 0868571 B1 2001-05-23 - DRY END

Title (en)

DRY END

Title (de)

TROCKENPARTIE

Title (fr)

TRAIN DE SECHAGE

Publication

EP 0868571 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96944054 A

Priority

  • DE 19548303 A
  • EP 9605798 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19548303A1] The invention relates to a dry end for drying a material web, in particular a paper or cardboard web, having at least one drying group with a plurality of drying cylinders and web guiding rollers and at least one nozzle device for transporting the threading part of the material web along a winding path by means of at least one conveyor band. The dry end is characterised in that groups of at least two nozzle devices (17, 19, 21) located at the same side of the material web (11) follow each other in the direction of transport of the material web (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00; D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0063 (2013.01); D21F 5/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19548303 A1 19970626; DE 19548303 B4 20060831; EP 0868571 A1 19981007; EP 0868571 B1 20010523; ID 15816 A 19970814; US 5987777 A 19991123; WO 9723690 A1 19970703

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606968

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131221

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606968

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121222

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606968 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE