Global Patent Index - EP 0868665 A4

EP 0868665 A4 2000-11-22 - FECAL TEST METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (en)

FECAL TEST METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (de)

FÄKALTESTVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG.

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE MATIERES FECALES

Publication

EP 0868665 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96944858 A

Priority

  • US 9620151 W
  • US 57762395 A
  • US 57712795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9723781A1] Methods are disclosed for determining the presence or amount of analyte in a fecal sample. In a preferred embodiment, a fecal sample is applied to an absorbent filter that contacts an immunochromatographic assay strip which contains a high concentration of detergent. The detergent extracts a surface antigen from an enteric pathogen and color is produced by a colloidal gold and selenium reaction system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; G01N 33/553; G01N 33/558; G01N 33/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/52 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/553 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/54366 (2013.01); G01N 33/521 (2013.01); G01N 33/54313 (2013.01); G01N 33/553 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9723781A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9723781 A1 19970703; AU 1336697 A 19970717; EP 0868665 A1 19981007; EP 0868665 A4 20001122; JP 2000502452 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-11-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01N 33/543 A, 7G 01N 33/553 B, 7G 01N 33/558 B, 7G 01N 33/569 B

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHILDS, MARY, ANN

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHOWDURY, MOHAMMED, A.

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHUNG, CRAIG

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CARTER, DIANE

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PRAKASH, ANJANA

2000-07-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BERNSTEIN, DAVID

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE