Global Patent Index - EP 0868865 A3

EP 0868865 A3 2000-09-06 - Carrousel, especially for kitchen cupboards

Title (en)

Carrousel, especially for kitchen cupboards

Title (de)

Dreheinsatz, insbesondere für Küchenschränke

Title (fr)

Carrousel, en particulier pour des placards de cuisine

Publication

EP 0868865 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890089 A

Priority

AT 55697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0868865A2] The insert (1) has an insert part (2) made up of sector-shaped parts (21-23) fitted together on a two-part support. The support consists of a bearing sleeve (4) with two bearing shells (41), which can close about a bearing journal (3). The sleeve has peripheral holders formed by radially protruding hooks. The sector-shaped parts have a support attachment, which is supported on the holders, and which has an open angle of up to (180 degrees ). The support attachment forms hanging windows for engaging on the hooks. The hooks lie inside two parallel tangential planes on the bearing sleeve and preferably have wedge faces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0868865 A2 19981007; EP 0868865 A3 20000906; AT 407601 B 20010525; AT A55697 A 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE