Global Patent Index - EP 0868911 A3

EP 0868911 A3 2000-12-06 - Rapamycin formulations for oral administration

Title (en)

Rapamycin formulations for oral administration

Title (de)

Rapamycin enthaltende Formulierungen zur oralen Verabreichung

Title (fr)

Formulations de rapamycine pour administration orale

Publication

EP 0868911 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98301716 A

Priority

US 81501597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0868911A2] This invention provides rapamycin solid dosage unit which comprises a core and a sugar overcoat, said sugar overcoat comprising rapamycin, one or more surface modifying agents, one or more sugars, and optionally one or more binders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/28; A61K 9/20; A61K 31/435

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/28 (2006.01); A61J 3/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/36 (2006.01); A61K 31/395 (2006.01); A61K 31/436 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7052 (2013.01); A61K 9/2086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0868911 A2 19981007; EP 0868911 A3 20001206; EP 0868911 B1 20020911; AR 012069 A1 20000927; AT 223705 T 20020915; AU 5838398 A 19980917; AU 723943 B2 20000907; BR 9801120 A 20000111; BR 9801120 B1 20091201; CA 2230748 A1 19980914; CA 2230748 C 20100803; CN 1140268 C 20040303; CN 1197639 A 19981104; CY 2313 B1 20031114; CZ 292949 B6 20040114; CZ 9800771 A3 19980916; DE 69807768 D1 20021017; DE 69807768 T2 20030206; DK 0868911 T3 20030120; ES 2183287 T3 20030316; HK 1015677 A1 20021220; HU 224701 B1 20060130; HU 9800573 A2 19990628; HU 9800573 A3 20000128; HU 9800573 D0 19980528; IL 123525 A 20020310; IL 123525 D0 19981030; JP 2009298823 A 20091224; JP 4616426 B2 20110119; JP H10259131 A 19980929; NZ 329976 A 19991028; PT 868911 E 20021231; RU 2220714 C2 20040110; SG 63824 A1 19990330; TW 550091 B 20030901; ZA 9802112 B 19990913

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-25 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20120309

2011-04-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WYETH

- Free text: WYETH#FIVE GIRALDA FARMS#MADISON, NEW JERSEY 07940-0874 (US) -TRANSFER TO- WYETH#FIVE GIRALDA FARMS#MADISON, NEW JERSEY 07940-0874 (US)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183287 T3

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-12-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403477

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807768 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991110;LT PAYMENT 19991110;LV PAYMENT 19991110;MK PAYMENT 19991110;RO PAYMENT 19991110;SI PAYMENT 19991110

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223705 T 20020915

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991110;LT PAYMENT 19991110;LV PAYMENT 19991110;MK PAYMENT 19991110;RO PAYMENT 19991110;SI PAYMENT 19991110

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991110;LT PAYMENT 19991110;LV PAYMENT 19991110;MK PAYMENT 19991110;RO PAYMENT 19991110;SI PAYMENT 19991110

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 9/28 A, 7A 61K 31/435 B, 7A 61K 9/20 B

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE