Global Patent Index - EP 0869093 B1

EP 0869093 B1 2000-11-02 - Device for automatically controlling the tension of a web in a printing machine

Title (en)

Device for automatically controlling the tension of a web in a printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Bahnspannung in einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle automatique de la tension d'une bande de matériaux dans une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0869093 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400746 A

Priority

FR 9704007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869093A1] The automatic tension control has a cyclic pulse emitter (6) actuated by the engrave or stereotype cylinder (1) of the printing assembly (A). An incremental pulse emitter (B) is actuated by the printed web. The outputs of the two emitters are connected to a regulator input PID (10), the other regulator input being connected to a reference base for the printing step (9'). The output of the regulator is connected to an electro-pneumatic converter (11) itself connected to a pneumatic actuator (5) acting on a cylinder for a web tensioner jockey wheel at the web output.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/188; B41F 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/1888 (2013.01); B41F 13/025 (2013.01); B65H 2301/31122 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2553/51 (2013.01); B65H 2557/31 (2013.01); B65H 2557/34 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/11 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869093 A1 19981007; EP 0869093 B1 20001102; DE 69800372 D1 20001207; FR 2761673 A1 19981009; FR 2761673 B1 19990618

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800372 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

1999-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990201

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB