Global Patent Index - EP 0869098 A3

EP 0869098 A3 2000-03-08 - Winch for mounting on a vehicle

Title (en)

Winch for mounting on a vehicle

Title (de)

Seilwinde zum Anbau an ein Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Treuil pour monter sur un véhicule

Publication

EP 0869098 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105373 A

Priority

DE 19713600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869098A2] The winch has a pulling device (9) for the cable (6) driven by a hydraulic drive (11), a guide path (41) for the cable and hydraulic control valves and electric controllers for operating the winch (7). The winch forms a stand-alone, essentially operationally ready unit (10) containing the cable drum (12,13), hydraulic drive motor, guide path, hydraulic components, controllers and mechanical structure parts (20,21,30). The unit is removably attached to the vehicle frame (1), whereby the end (27) of the unit towards the vehicle rear is mounted on a structural part consisting of a supporting plate (20) and the front end (28) of the unit is connected to a carrying bar (21). The supporting plate and carrying bar are attached to the vehicle frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 1/00; B66D 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/00 (2006.01); B66D 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/00 (2013.01); B66D 1/741 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869098 A2 19981007; EP 0869098 A3 20000308; EP 0869098 B1 20050921; DE 19713600 A1 19981008; DE 59813063 D1 20060202; ES 2247644 T3 20060301

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150326

2016-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160428

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247644 T3

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813063 P 20060202

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813063 P 20051027

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROTZLER GMBH + CO. KG

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE