Global Patent Index - EP 0869100 B1

EP 0869100 B1 2001-03-28 - Material handling implement

Title (en)

Material handling implement

Title (de)

Handhabungsfahrzeug für Material

Title (fr)

Véhicule de manutention de matériaux

Publication

EP 0869100 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97110221 A

Priority

GB 9706859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869100A1] A material handling implement (10) comprising a carrier (25), a load engageable device (30) movable relative to the carrier (25) in a sideways direction and side shift means to cause movement of the load engageable device (30) relative to the carrier (25) in said sideways direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/14; B66F 9/065

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/065 (2006.01); B66F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/0655 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869100 A1 19981007; EP 0869100 B1 20010328; CA 2208472 A1 19981004; CA 2208472 C 20040525; DE 69704417 D1 20010503; DE 69704417 T2 20010705; GB 2323832 A 19981007; GB 2323832 B 20000712; GB 9706859 D0 19970521; GB 9713183 D0 19970827; JP H10279293 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69704417

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704417 20010503

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980123

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT