Global Patent Index - EP 0869191 A3

EP 0869191 A3 2000-10-04 - Muffle for heat treating furnace

Title (en)

Muffle for heat treating furnace

Title (de)

Muffel für Wärmebehandlungsofen

Title (fr)

Moufle pour four de traitement thermique

Publication

EP 0869191 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98105206 A

Priority

IT VI970050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0869191A2] A muffle for insertion in continuously cycled or batch furnaces for thermal treatment operations. It has a body (1) of a form elongated in the direction of advancement of the products to be treated. This body (1) delimits, within its inner volume, a chamber (2) through which the products pass on a conveyor belt or in which the products are placed statically. The body (1) is produced preferably by means of a paste with a base of ceramic material such as silicon carbide with or without a refractory stainless steel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/00; F27B 5/10; F27B 9/06; F27B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/06 (2006.01); F27B 9/08 (2006.01); F27B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/0043 (2013.01); F27B 9/063 (2013.01); F27B 9/084 (2013.01); F27B 9/243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0869191 A2 19981007; EP 0869191 A3 20001004; IT 1292971 B1 19990211; IT VI970050 A1 19980928; IT VI970050 D0 19970328

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 21D 9/00 A, 7F 27B 5/10 B, 7F 27B 9/06 B, 7F 27B 9/08 B

1998-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE